California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2130 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 08/06/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2130AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 17, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Gorell and Morrell FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to add Section 13511.4 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2130, as amended, Gorell. Peace officers: training. Existing law requires every peace officer, as defined, to satisfactorily complete an introductory course of training prescribed by the Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training, demonstrated by passage of an appropriate examination developed or approved by the commission, prior to exercising the powers of a peace officer. Existing law authorizes the commission to evaluate and approve pertinent training previously completed by any jurisdiction's law enforcement officers as meeting current training requirements. This bill would authorize the commission to evaluate pertinent military police officer training previously completed by any jurisdiction's law enforcement officers for the  purposes   purpose  of determining whether the training meets the current training requirements prescribed by the commission. The bill would authorize the commission to develop a protocol that considers previous military police officer training as an applicable substitute for portions of the current standard training.  The bill would require the commission to report to the Legislature by January 1, 2014, on the development of the protocol.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13511.4 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 13511.4. (a) The commission may evaluate pertinent military police officer training previously completed by any jurisdiction's law enforcement officers for the  purposes   purpose  of determining whether the training meets the current training requirements prescribed by the commission pursuant to this chapter  ,  and may consider previous military police officer training as part of the commission's basic course waiver process. (b) The commission may develop a protocol that considers previous military police officer training as an applicable substitute for portions of the current standard training. In developing the protocol, the commission shall do  all   both  of the following: (1) Assess the content and transferability of military police officer training to fulfill the commission's program requirements. (2) Identify additional training requirements that must be fulfilled to satisfactorily complete the commission's certification program.  (3) Develop a modular training standard for the purpose of satisfying the unmet requirements identified by the commission pursuant to paragraph (2).   (c) The commission shall report to the Legislature, by January 1, 2014, on the development of the protocol required by this section.   (d) (1) The requirement for submitting a report imposed under subdivision (c) is inoperative on July 31, 2017, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.   (2) The report required pursuant to subdivision (c) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.