|
09/30/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6560.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4902.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5126.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|