California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill July 6, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012