BILL NUMBER: AB 2133AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 19, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 21, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Blumenfield and Silva FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act to amend Section 66025.8 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2133, as amended, Blumenfield. Veterans: priority registration. Existing law, the Donahoe Higher Education Act, sets forth the missions and functions of the public institutions of higher education in the state, which include the California Community Colleges, the California State University, and the University of California. Existing law requires the California State University and each community college district, and requests the University of California, to grant priority registration for enrollment to a member or former member of the Armed Forces of the United States, who is a resident of California, and who has received an honorable discharge, a general discharge, or an other than honorable discharge, and to any member or former member of the State Military Reserve who has not received a specified discharge, for any academic term attended at one of these institutions within 4 years of leaving state or federal active duty. This bill also would enact the Combat to College Act of 2012, which wouldextend the period during which those institutions are required, and requested, to grant priority registration for enrollment to within 15 years of leaving state or federal active dutyauthorize a qualifying student to use the 4 academic years during which these institutions are required, or requested, to grant priority registration for enrollment within 15 years of his or her leaving state or federal active duty . The bill also would require the priority registration for enrollment to apply to enrollment for all degree and certificate programs offered by the institution after the military or veteran status of the student has been verified by the institution he or she attends. The bill would require students receiving this priority to comply with specified requirements. By requiring community college districts to provide priority registration for enrollmentfor additional yearsover a longer span of time , the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. This act shall be known, and may be cited, as the Combat to College Act of 2012. SEC. 2. Section 66025.8 of the Education Code is amended to read: 66025.8. (a) The California State University and each community college district shall, and the University of California is requested to, with respect to each campus in their respective jurisdictions that administers a priority enrollment system, grant priority in that system for registration for enrollment to any member or former member of the Armed Forces of the United States, and who is a resident of California, who has received an honorable discharge, a general discharge, or an other than honorable discharge, and to any member or former member of the State Military Reserve, for any academic term attended at one of these institutionswithin 15 years of leavingfor four academic years after he or she has left state or federal active duty , which he or she shall use within 15 years of leaving state or federal active duty . (b) A former member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the State Military Reserve who received a dishonorable discharge or a bad conduct discharge is not eligible for priority registration for enrollment pursuant to this section. (c) The priority registration for enrollment provided pursuant to this section shall apply to enrollment for all degree and certificate programs offered by the institution after the military or veteran status of the student has been verified by the institution he or she attends. (d) Students who receive priority registration for enrollment pursuant to this section shall comply with the requirements of subdivision (a) of Section 78212. (e) (1) For the purposes of this section, "Armed Forces of the United States" means the Air Force, Army, Coast Guard, Marine Corps, National Guard, Naval Militia, Navy, and the reserve components of each of those forces, including the California National Guard. (2) As used in this section, "member or former member of the Armed Forces of the United States" includes, but is not necessarily limited to, any student who is called to active military duty compelling that student to take an academic leave of absence. SEC. 3. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.