LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2133
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2133
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2133
Compare Versions
AB2133 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB2133 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB2133 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2133 Amended June 19, 2012
AB2133 Amended April 26, 2012
AB2133 Amended March 21, 2012
AB2133 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2133 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB2133 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB2133 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2133 Amended June 19, 2012
AB2133 Amended April 26, 2012
AB2133 Amended March 21, 2012
AB2133 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare