California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill March 21, 2012