|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4563.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|