LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2164
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2164
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2164
Compare Versions
AB2164 Amended June 21, 2012
AB2164 Amended May 31, 2012
AB2164 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2164 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2164 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2164 Amended June 21, 2012
AB2164 Amended May 31, 2012
AB2164 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2164 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2164 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare