|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 6373.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4781.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 4817.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|