California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill June 25, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012