|
08/30/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 12. Noes 21. Page 4779.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Kehoe. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4780.)
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 4978.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|