California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2196 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012