|
09/20/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6244.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4643.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4816.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4773.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|