California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012
Bill May 10, 2012