California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2202 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/12/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2202AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 12, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 20, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block FEBRUARY 23, 2012 An act  to amend Section 49704 of the Education Code,  relating to  postsecondary education   the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2202, as amended, Block.  Postsecondary education: expanding access.  Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children: task force.   Existing law ratifies the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children to, among other things, facilitate the enrollment, placement, advancement, and transfer of the academic records of the children of military families for the purpose of removing barriers to their educational success due to the frequent moves and deployment of their parents. The compact establishes the Interstate Commission on Educational Opportunity for Military Children to, among other things, provide for dispute resolution among member states, promulgate rules, and take other actions necessary for the administration of the compact.   Existing law, until January 1, 2013, requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to reconvene a task force initially convened pursuant to a provision of existing law to review and make recommendations regarding the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children. Existing law requires this task force to be reconvened on or after July 1, 2012, and on or before September 1, 2012, and to issue a final report of findings and conclusions on prescribed topics to the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of both houses of the Legislature no later than December 1, 2012.   This bill would extend the effective date of provisions regarding the task force and its duties to January 1, 2016.   Existing law establishes the segments of the postsecondary education system in the state, including independent institutions of higher education, the University of California, administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges.   This bill would require the Legislative Analyst's Office to conduct a study that considers specified things and make recommendations regarding opportunities for expanding access to postsecondary education in underserved areas. The bill would require the Legislative Analyst's Office to submit its report to the Legislature on or before January 1, 2014.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 49704 of the   Education Code   is amended to read:  49704. (a) On or after July 1, 2012, and on or before September 1, 2012, the Superintendent shall reconvene, with its original membership to the extent possible, the task force that was convened pursuant to Section 2 of Chapter 589 of the Statutes of 2008 for the purpose of reviewing and making recommendations regarding the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children. (b) The reconvened task force  shall  also  shall  include the military family education liaison and the compact commissioner  ,  if the individuals serving in those roles were not members of the original task force. (c) The reconvened task force shall review the impact of the compact on California, its school districts and its  students   pupils  , and issue a final report regarding these impacts that includes, at a minimum, all of the following: (1) The impacts on children of military families. (2) The impacts on  students   pupils  who are not children of military families. (3) The impacts on schools and school districts. (4) The nature of interactions between California school districts and education agencies in other states. (5) The nature of interactions between California, its schools and school districts, and the Interstate Commission on Educational Opportunity for Military Children. (6) The extent and content of any regulatory or rulemaking actions taken by the Interstate Commission on Educational Opportunity for Military Children. (7) The extent to which decisions made by the Interstate Commission on Educational Opportunity for Military Children have overridden or been in conflict with California law. (8) Any unintended and unanticipated consequences to California, or its  students   pupils  , schools or school districts, resulting from entering into this compact. (9) Any costs to the state or to  school  districts, either as direct costs or as reimbursements of state-mandated local costs. (d) A member of the task force is subject to each of the following requirements: (1) He or she may use teleconferencing,  phone   telephone  conferencing, or both, to participate in the reconvening of the task force. (2) He or she shall not receive compensation for his or her services as a member of the task force or reimbursement for expenses. (e) The task force shall present a final report of findings and conclusions, including any recommendations for legislative action, if necessary, to the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of both houses of the Legislature no later than December 1, 2012. The report shall be concise ,  and may be produced and submitted solely in electronic format. (f) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2013   2016  , and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,  2013   2016  , deletes or extends that date.  SECTION 1.   The Legislative Analyst's Office shall conduct a study and make recommendations regarding opportunities for expanding access to postsecondary education in underserved areas. The study shall consider the expansion of distance education, the establishment of off-campus centers and new campuses, regional partnerships with existing postsecondary education providers, local admissions guarantees, and other strategies the Legislative Analyst's Office finds to have merit. The Legislative Analyst's Office shall submit its report to the Legislature on or before January 1, 2014.