California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill July 6, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill March 20, 2012