LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2202
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2202
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2202
Compare Versions
AB2202 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB2202 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB2202 Amended August 13, 2012
AB2202 Amended July 6, 2012
AB2202 Amended June 12, 2012
AB2202 Amended May 25, 2012
AB2202 Amended March 20, 2012
AB2202 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2202 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB2202 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB2202 Amended August 13, 2012
AB2202 Amended July 6, 2012
AB2202 Amended June 12, 2012
AB2202 Amended May 25, 2012
AB2202 Amended March 20, 2012
AB2202 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare