|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 254, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5908.).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4223.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4491.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|