LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2212
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2212
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2212
Compare Versions
AB2212 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB2212 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB2212 Amended June 4, 2012
AB2212 Amended May 7, 2012
AB2212 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2212 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB2212 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB2212 Amended June 4, 2012
AB2212 Amended May 7, 2012
AB2212 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare