California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2227 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012