LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2227
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2227
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2227
Compare Versions
AB2227 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB2227 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2227 Amended August 7, 2012
AB2227 Amended June 12, 2012
AB2227 Amended May 15, 2012
AB2227 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2227 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2227 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB2227 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2227 Amended August 7, 2012
AB2227 Amended June 12, 2012
AB2227 Amended May 15, 2012
AB2227 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2227 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare