|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4575.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4985.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and AGRI. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|