California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012