|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6653.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4932.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4821.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|