California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 23, 2012