|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 482, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 30). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6702.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6554.)
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 4872.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to the unfinished business file. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4483.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4786.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|