California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012