|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 11).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 4928.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4812.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|