California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2281 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/27/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2281AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 18, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torres FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Sections 53115.1 and 53115.2 of the Government Code, relating to emergencies. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2281, as amended, Torres. Emergencies: State 911 Advisory Board. (1) The Warren-911-Emergency Assistance Act requires a local public agency to adopt a plan to implement a 911 emergency telephone response system, and establishes the State 911 Advisory Board to advise on specified subjects relating to the state's 911 emergency telephone response system. The board is comprised of 11 members who are appointed by, and serve at the pleasure of, the Governor. This bill would add 2 members to the advisory board who would be selected by the Legislature, as specified. This bill would also make legislative findings and declarations and eliminate the ability of a member of the advisory board to designate another to act in his or her place. (2) Existing law requires the Public Safety Communication Division to assist a local public agency in the development of its plan to implement a 911 emergency telephone response system, and to approve a final plan before it is implemented. Existing law requires the board to, if requested by a local public agency, conduct a hearing on any conflict between a local agency and the Public Safety Communication Division regarding a final plan. This bill would, instead, require the board to, if requested by a local agency, conduct a hearing on any conflict between a local public agency and the Public Safety Communication Division regarding that agency's 911 emergency telephone response system and cost reimbursement decisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares that an effective and efficient State 911 Advisory Board would foster interagency collaboration to guide California in the implementation of Next Generation 911, the provision of advance notice of general meetings, and the use of designees, at the board's discretion, for purposes other than general meetings. SEC. 2. Section 53115.1 of the Government Code is amended to read: 53115.1. (a) There is in state government the State 911 Advisory Board. (b) The advisory board shall be comprised of the following members appointed by the Governor who shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor. (1) The Chief of the California 911 Emergency Communications Office shall serve as the nonvoting chair of the board. (2) One representative from the Department of the California Highway Patrol. (3) Two representatives on the recommendation of the California Police Chiefs Association. (4) Two representatives on the recommendation of the California State Sheriffs' Association. (5) Two representatives on the recommendation of the California Fire Chiefs Association. (6) Two representatives on the recommendation of the CalNENA Executive Board. (7) One representative on the joint recommendation of the executive boards of the state chapters of the Association of Public-Safety Communications Officials-International, Inc. (c) The Speaker of the Assembly shall appoint one member of the advisory board,  for a   two-year term,  who will serve at the pleasure of the Speaker. (d) The Senate Committee on Rules shall appoint one member of the advisory board,  for a two-year term,  who will serve at the pleasure of the  chairperson   committee  . (e) Recommending authorities shall give great weight and consideration to the knowledge, training, and expertise of the appointee with respect to his or her experience within the California 911 system. Board members should have at least two years of experience as a Public Safety Answering Point (PSAP) manager or county coordinator, except where a specific person is designated as a member. (f) Members of the advisory board selected under subdivision (b) shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor, but may not serve more than two consecutive two-year terms, except as follows: (1) The presiding Chief of the California 911 Emergency Communications Office shall serve for the duration of his or her tenure. (2) Four of the members shall serve an initial term of three years. (g) Advisory board members shall not receive compensation for their service on the board, but may be reimbursed for travel and per diem for time spent in attending meetings of the board. (h) The advisory board shall meet quarterly in public sessions in accordance with the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2). The division shall provide administrative support to the State 911 Advisory Board. The State 911 Advisory Board, at its first meeting, shall adopt bylaws and operating procedures consistent with this article and establish committees as necessary. SEC. 3. Section 53115.2 of the Government Code is amended to read: 53115.2. (a) The State 911 Advisory Board shall advise the division on all of the following subjects: (1) Policies, practices, and procedures for the California 911 Emergency Communications Office. (2) Technical and operational standards for the California 911 system consistent with the National Emergency Number Association (NENA) standards. (3) Training standards for county coordinators and Public Safety Answering Point (PSAP) managers. (4) Budget, funding, and reimbursement decisions related to the State Emergency Number Account. (5) Proposed projects and studies conducted or funded by the State Emergency Number Account. (6) Expediting the rollout of Enhanced 911 Phase II technology. (b) Upon request of a local public agency, the board shall conduct a hearing on any conflict between a local public agency and the division regarding that agency's 911 emergency telephone system and cost reimbursement decisions. The board shall meet within 30 days following the request, and shall make a recommendation to resolve the conflict to the division within 90 days following the initial hearing by the board pursuant to the request.