|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5176.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 5177.)
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5087.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|