California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2284 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 30, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012