|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 373, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 4. Page 6317.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4700.).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4886.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|