LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2291
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2291
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2291
Compare Versions
AB2291 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB2291 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2291 Amended June 13, 2012
AB2291 Amended May 3, 2012
AB2291 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2291 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2291 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB2291 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2291 Amended June 13, 2012
AB2291 Amended May 3, 2012
AB2291 Amended April 24, 2012
AB2291 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare