|
07/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:40 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1383.).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1240.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|