BILL NUMBER: AB 230CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 50 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 1, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JUNE 29, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 11, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 5, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Carter (Coauthors: Assembly Members Dickinson, Portantino, and Solorio) (Coauthor: Senator Wolk) FEBRUARY 2, 2011 An act to amend Section 76001 of the Education Code, relating to joint educational programs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 230, Carter. Joint educational programs: middle college high school students: enrollment priority. Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law establishes community college districts, administered by a governing board, throughout the state, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction to students at the community college campuses maintained by the districts. Existing law authorizes the establishment of middle college high schools, which are alternative high schools located on community college campuses, and structured as broad-based, comprehensive instructional programs focusing on college preparatory and school-to-work curricula, career education, work experience, community service, and support and motivational activities. Existing law requires the governing board of a community college district to assign a low enrollment priority to specified special part-time or full-time students, which includes middle college high school students, in order to ensure that these students do not displace regularly admitted students. This bill would provide that the low enrollment priority provisions do not apply to a student attending a middle college high school, if the student is seeking to enroll in a community college course that is required for the student's middle college high school program. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 76001 of the Education Code is amended to read: 76001. (a) The governing board of a community college district may admit to any community college under its jurisdiction as a special part-time or full-time student in any session or term any student who is eligible to attend community college pursuant to Section 48800 or 48800.5. (b) If the governing board denies a request for a special part-time or full-time enrollment at a community college for a pupil who is identified as highly gifted, the board shall record its findings and the reasons for denial of the request in writing within 60 days. The written recommendation and denial shall be issued at the next regularly scheduled board meeting that falls at least 30 days after the request has been submitted. (c) The attendance of a pupil at a community college as a special part-time or full-time student pursuant to this section is authorized attendance, for which the community college shall be credited or reimbursed pursuant to Sections 48802 and 76002. Credit for courses completed shall be at the level determined to be appropriate by the school district and community college district governing boards. (d) For purposes of this section, a special part-time student may enroll in up to, and including, 11 units per semester, or the equivalent thereof, at the community college. (e) (1) Except as provided in paragraph (2), the governing board of a community college district shall assign a low enrollment priority to special part-time or full-time students described in subdivision (a) in order to ensure that these students do not displace regularly admitted students. (2) This subdivision does not apply to a student attending a middle college high school as described in Section 11300, if the student is seeking to enroll in a community college course that is required for the student's middle college high school program.