|
09/17/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 6113.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4569.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 5063.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and J., E.D. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|