California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2309 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/27/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2309ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill (Coauthor: Assembly Member Beall) FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add and repeal Article 7 (commencing with Section 79220) of Chapter 9 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2309, Hill. Community colleges: Public-Private Partnership Pilot Program. Existing law establishes the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law establishes community college districts, administered by a governing board, throughout the state, and authorizes these districts to provide instruction to students at the community college campuses maintained by the districts. This bill would authorize the board of governors, once sufficient funding becomes available, to establish a competitive grant pilot program to evaluate a public-private partnership model designed to accomplish specified objectives relating to business development and job creation. The bill would require the board of governors to select partnering community college districts and private entities to participate in the pilot program that best demonstrate the ability to fulfill those objectives and specified agreement requirements that the bill would impose. Upon completion of the pilot program, the bill would require specified entities to prepare a written summary that would be posted on the community college district's Internet Web site, as specified. The bill would provide that the pilot program only would be operative if the Legislature appropriates funds expressly, or if sufficient private funding is received, for purposes of this bill, whichever comes first. The bill would repeal the pilot program on January 1, 2016. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 7 (commencing with Section 79220) is added to Chapter 9 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, to read: Article 7. Public-Private Partnership Pilot Program 79220. (a) The board of governors may establish, once sufficient funding for this purpose becomes available, a competitive grant pilot program to evaluate a public-private partnership model designed to accomplish all of the following objectives: (1) Promote business development and job creation by helping early stage business ventures with new ideas to either find early stage funding or to reach the point of operating stability. (2) Leverage the underutilized infrastructure and nascent entrepreneurship programs of the community college system to sponsor programs that encourage and reward creativity, collaboration, and innovation. (3) Recruit and coordinate businesses and investors from the local community to provide funding, sponsorships, and internships. (b) The board of governors shall select partnering community college districts and private entities to participate in the pilot program that best demonstrate the ability to fulfill the objectives specified in subdivision (a) and the agreement requirements specified in subdivision (c). (c) A community college district and a private entity that are selected to participate in the pilot program as partners shall enter into an agreement to, at a minimum, do all of the following: (1) Identify the administration and management structure of the pilot program. (2) Define the scope of the pilot program. (3) Set the beginning, end, and other strategic dates of the pilot program for the purpose of evaluating the public-private partnership model. (4) Identify the process that will be used, and the key stakeholders who will be engaged, in the development, testing, and refining of the public-private partnership model. (5) Identify entities to be responsible for preparing the written summary required pursuant to subdivision (c). (6) Identify financial and in-kind contributions each party makes to the pilot program. (d) (1) Upon the completion of the pilot program, the entities identified pursuant to paragraph (5) of subdivision (b) shall prepare a written summary of findings and recommendations for, and a description of, the public-private partnership model to be posted on the community college district's Internet Web site. (2) Within 30 days of the information being posted pursuant to paragraph (1), the community college district shall provide letters to the Dean of the California Community Colleges' Economic and Workforce Development Program, the Director of the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, and the relevant policy committees of the Legislature notifying them of the posting. 79221. This article shall be operative only if the Legislature appropriates funds expressly, or if sufficient private funding is received, for purposes of this article, whichever comes first. 79222. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2016, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2016, deletes or extends that date.