|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6248.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4705.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3606.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|