California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill June 14, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012