|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 256, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6115.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4585.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4569.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|