California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2343 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill March 28, 2012