|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5957.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4478.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4890.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|