California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill July 6, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill June 4, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012