|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6319.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 4717.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 21. Page 4990.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|