California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill June 18, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012