|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
From committee: That the measure be returned with further amendments to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 23). Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5132.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|