California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2392 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012