|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6426.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 4748.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4882.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 4332.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4332.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on L. & E.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|