California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012