|
07/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5601.).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4224.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4874.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|